Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/10/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 02/10/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 02/10/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 02/10/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/10/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 02/10/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/10/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 02/10/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/24/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 02/24/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 02/24/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/24/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 02/24/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/24/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/17/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/19/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/19/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/19/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/19/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/19/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/19/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/19/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/19/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 03/19/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/19/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/19/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 03/19/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/23/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/23/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/23/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/23/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/23/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 03/26/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/26/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/26/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/26/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 03/26/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/02/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/21/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/21/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 04/21/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/21/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 04/21/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/21/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/21/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 05/04/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/04/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/02/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 06/03/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/19/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 07/08/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/21/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/24/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/17/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 11/17/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 11/18/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 12/16/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/16/2010
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 03/18/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/25/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/14/2010