Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/10/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/05/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/05/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/05/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/05/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/05/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/05/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/05/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/05/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/05/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/05/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 03/05/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 03/18/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/25/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 03/25/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/25/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 03/25/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/25/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/25/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/30/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/21/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 04/30/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/30/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/30/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/10/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/07/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/10/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/13/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 07/15/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/28/2009