Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/12/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 03/12/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/12/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 03/12/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 03/12/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/12/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 03/12/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/12/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/12/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/12/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/12/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/12/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/12/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 03/12/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/12/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/12/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/12/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/12/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/12/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/12/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/12/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/12/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/12/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/12/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/12/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/12/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/18/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/02/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 04/23/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/23/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 04/23/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 04/23/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/23/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/05/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/05/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/05/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 05/21/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/21/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/03/2009