Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/13/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 02/13/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/13/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 02/13/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/23/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/23/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/23/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/23/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/07/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/07/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/07/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/12/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/21/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/16/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/30/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 10/08/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 10/08/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/08/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/16/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/16/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/16/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/16/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 11/16/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/16/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 11/16/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/16/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/16/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/16/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/18/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/18/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 11/18/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 11/19/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/16/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 12/16/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/13/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 01/13/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/03/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 02/25/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/25/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/25/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/25/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/25/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/25/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/25/2010
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/25/2010
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 02/25/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 02/25/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/25/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/04/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/04/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/25/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/25/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/28/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/28/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/28/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/28/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/28/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/28/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/28/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/28/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/13/2010
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 05/24/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/01/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/01/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/16/2010