Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 02/04/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 02/04/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/04/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 02/04/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 02/10/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/10/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/11/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/11/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/11/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/23/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/23/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/12/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/12/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/02/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/08/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/08/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/13/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/13/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/13/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/13/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/17/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 07/17/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/17/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/23/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/23/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 09/08/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/08/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 09/08/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/08/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 10/28/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 11/06/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 11/06/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 12/08/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 12/08/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 12/08/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 01/13/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 01/13/2010
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 01/21/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/09/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/09/2010
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/18/2010
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/18/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/09/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/09/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 06/09/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/10/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/10/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/23/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/14/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/14/2010
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 07/14/2010
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 07/22/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 07/22/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/22/2010
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/15/2010