Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/04/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/12/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/05/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/05/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/10/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/21/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 06/09/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/25/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/13/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 02/02/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 02/02/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/23/2010
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 03/09/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/20/2010
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/22/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/12/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/14/2010
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 06/24/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 06/24/2010
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/01/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/16/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/22/2010