Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/10/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 02/23/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 02/26/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/26/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/03/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/03/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/03/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/03/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/10/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/10/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/10/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/10/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/23/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/30/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/30/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/02/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/02/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/02/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/30/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/07/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/13/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/13/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/21/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/21/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/13/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/15/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/09/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 10/27/2009
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 04/26/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/29/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/29/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/20/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 06/22/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 06/22/2010

Show cosponsors who withdrew