Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/04/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/04/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 02/04/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/04/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/04/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 02/04/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/10/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/10/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/10/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/10/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/13/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 02/25/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 03/04/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/04/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/04/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/04/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/04/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/04/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/05/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/05/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/05/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 03/10/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/10/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/10/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/12/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 03/16/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/16/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/24/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 03/26/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/26/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/31/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/22/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/22/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/29/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/04/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/07/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 05/07/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/20/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/04/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/09/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/09/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 07/15/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/28/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/28/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/10/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/10/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/15/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 09/16/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 09/16/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/16/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/22/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/13/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/13/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/20/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 10/20/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 10/22/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/16/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/19/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 11/19/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/19/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/19/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 11/19/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/01/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 12/01/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/01/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 12/01/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/01/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 12/01/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 12/01/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 12/01/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/02/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 12/08/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 12/09/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/15/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 12/15/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 12/16/2009
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 01/12/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 01/20/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 01/21/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/16/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/15/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 04/22/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/22/2010
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/26/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/12/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/09/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/20/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/22/2010