Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 02/03/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 02/03/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/03/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/03/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/23/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/23/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/23/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/23/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/23/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/23/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 02/23/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/23/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/06/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/23/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/23/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/23/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/23/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/29/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/29/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/29/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 04/30/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/04/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/20/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/20/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/20/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/03/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/03/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/03/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/03/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/03/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/03/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/03/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/08/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 06/09/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/21/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 07/21/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/22/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 10/06/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/22/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 10/29/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/01/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/27/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 02/22/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/25/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/24/2010
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 06/24/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/30/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/15/2010