Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/03/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/04/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/10/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/10/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/10/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/02/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/02/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/04/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/06/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 03/17/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/17/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/24/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/24/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/23/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/23/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/23/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/23/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/23/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/23/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 04/23/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/30/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 05/12/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/21/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/04/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 06/11/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/26/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/26/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/26/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/15/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 07/22/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/28/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 07/28/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/31/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/31/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 09/09/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/09/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/22/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/22/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/22/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 09/25/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/15/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/21/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/21/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/21/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/27/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/29/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 01/26/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/22/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/02/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/10/2010
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/30/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/30/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/01/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 08/10/2010