Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 01/27/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 01/27/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 01/27/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 01/28/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 01/28/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 01/28/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/28/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/28/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 01/28/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 01/28/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 01/28/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 01/28/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 01/28/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 01/28/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 01/28/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 01/28/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/28/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 01/28/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 01/28/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 01/28/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 01/28/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 01/28/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 01/28/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/28/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 01/28/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/28/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 01/28/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 01/28/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 01/28/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 01/28/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/28/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/04/2009
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 02/04/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 02/04/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 02/04/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/04/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 02/04/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 02/04/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/04/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/04/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/04/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/04/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 02/04/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/04/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/04/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/04/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/04/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/04/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 02/04/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/04/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/04/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 02/12/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 02/12/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/12/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/12/2009
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 02/12/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/12/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 02/12/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 02/12/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/12/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 02/12/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/12/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 03/09/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 03/09/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/09/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/09/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/09/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/09/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/09/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 03/09/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/09/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/09/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/09/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/09/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 04/02/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/02/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 06/04/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 06/04/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 06/10/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/12/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/12/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/31/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/08/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/11/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/11/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/15/2010