Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/19/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/10/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/16/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/17/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 12/01/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/26/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/26/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/15/2010