Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/26/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/28/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 01/28/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 01/28/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/03/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/03/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/11/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/11/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/11/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/11/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/11/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/11/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/11/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/23/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/23/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/23/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/23/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/23/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/23/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/23/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/23/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/23/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/23/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/23/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/23/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/23/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/23/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/23/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/23/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/23/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/03/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/03/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/03/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/05/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/05/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/17/2009
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 03/17/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/19/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/19/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/19/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 03/24/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/24/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/30/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/31/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/21/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/20/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/20/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/02/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/09/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/11/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/12/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/12/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/15/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/09/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/09/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 07/31/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/29/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 10/07/2009

Show cosponsors who withdrew