Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 01/26/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/10/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/10/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/10/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/23/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 02/23/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 02/26/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/26/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/04/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/04/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/09/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/18/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/23/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/31/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 03/31/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/21/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/30/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 07/20/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/09/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/25/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/02/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/09/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/28/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 05/06/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 05/20/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/20/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/20/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/20/2010
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 05/20/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/24/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/16/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/16/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/16/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/22/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/27/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/16/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 12/08/2010