Refine your search

Date Major Actions
01/07/2011 Became Public Law No: 111-383.
01/07/2011 Signed by President.
12/29/2010 Presented to President.
12/22/2010 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to without objection.
12/22/2010 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/17/2010 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 341 - 48 (Roll no. 650).(text: CR H8629-8750)
12/15/2010 Introduced in House