Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/25/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 04/22/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/16/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/22/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/22/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/29/2010