Text: H.R.6419 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

There is one version of the bill.

Bill text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/17/2010)


Formatting necessary for an accurate reading of this legislative text may be shown by tags (e.g., <DELETED> or <BOLD>) or may be missing from this TXT display. For complete and accurate display of this text, see the PDF or HTML/XML.




[Congressional Bills 111th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H.R. 6419 Introduced in House (IH)]

111th CONGRESS
  2d Session
                                H. R. 6419

 To amend the Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2008 to provide for the 
  further extension of emergency unemployment benefits, and for other 
                               purposes.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                           November 17, 2010

  Mr. McDermott (for himself, Mr. Levin, Mr. Kildee, Mr. Dingell, Ms. 
 Matsui, Mr. Gutierrez, Ms. Berkley, Ms. Pingree of Maine, Ms. Norton, 
     Mr. Stark, Mr. Grijalva, Ms. Hirono, Mr. Conyers, Ms. Lee of 
 California, Mr. Blumenauer, Mr. Nadler of New York, Ms. DeLauro, Mr. 
 Ellison, Mr. Langevin, and Mr. Olver) introduced the following bill; 
         which was referred to the Committee on Ways and Means

_______________________________________________________________________

                                 A BILL


 
 To amend the Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2008 to provide for the 
  further extension of emergency unemployment benefits, and for other 
                               purposes.

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE.

    This Act may be cited as the ``Emergency Unemployment Compensation 
Continuation Act''.

SEC. 2. EXTENSION OF UNEMPLOYMENT INSURANCE PROVISIONS.

    (a) In General.--(1) Section 4007 of the Supplemental 
Appropriations Act, 2008 (Public Law 110-252; 26 U.S.C. 3304 note) is 
amended--
            (A) by striking ``November 30, 2010'' each place it appears 
        and inserting ``February 28, 2011'';
            (B) in the heading for paragraph (2) of subsection (b), by 
        striking ``November 30, 2010'' and inserting ``February 28, 
        2011''; and
            (C) in subsection (b)(3), by striking ``April 30, 2011'' 
        and inserting ``July 31, 2011''.
    (2) Section 2005 of the Assistance for Unemployed Workers and 
Struggling Families Act, as contained in Public Law 111-5 (26 U.S.C. 
3304 note), is amended--
            (A) by striking ``December 1, 2010'' each place it appears 
        and inserting ``March 1, 2011''; and
            (B) in subsection (c), by striking ``May 1, 2011'' and 
        inserting ``August 1, 2011''.
    (3) Section 5 of the Unemployment Compensation Extension Act of 
2008 (Public Law 110-449; 26 U.S.C. 3304 note) is amended by striking 
``April 30, 2011'' and inserting ``July 31, 2011''.
    (b) Funding.--Section 4004(e)(1) of the Supplemental Appropriations 
Act, 2008 (Public Law 110-252; 26 U.S.C. 3304 note) is amended--
            (1) in subparagraph (E), by striking ``and'' at the end; 
        and
            (2) by inserting after subparagraph (F) the following:
                    ``(G) the amendments made by section 2(a)(1) of the 
                Emergency Unemployment Compensation Continuation Act; 
                and''.
    (c) Effective Date.--The amendments made by this section shall take 
effect as if included in the enactment of the Unemployment Compensation 
Extension Act of 2010 (Public Law 111-205; 124 Stat. 2236).

SEC. 3. TEMPORARY MODIFICATION OF INDICATORS.

    (a) Indicators Based on Rate of Insured Unemployment.--Section 
203(d) of the Federal-State Extended Unemployment Compensation Act of 
1970 (26 U.S.C. 3304 note) is amended by inserting before the last 
sentence the following: ``Effective with respect to compensation for 
weeks of unemployment beginning after the date of enactment of the 
Emergency Unemployment Compensation Continuation Act (or, if later, the 
date established pursuant to State law), and ending on or before March 
1, 2011, the State may by law provide that the determination of whether 
there has been a State `on' or `off' indicator beginning or ending any 
extended benefit period shall be made under this subsection as if 
paragraph (1)(A) had been amended by striking `the preceding two 
calendar years' and inserting `the preceding three calendar years'; 
except that, notwithstanding any such provision of State law, any week 
for which there would otherwise be a State `on' indicator shall 
continue to be such a week and shall not be determined to be a week for 
which there is a State `off' indicator.''.
    (b) Indicators Based on Rate of Total Unemployment.--Section 203(f) 
of the Federal-State Extended Unemployment Compensation Act of 1970 (26 
U.S.C. 3304 note) is amended--
            (1) by redesignating paragraph (2) as paragraph (3); and
            (2) by inserting after paragraph (1) the following:
    ``(2) Effective with respect to compensation for weeks of 
unemployment beginning after the date of enactment of the Emergency 
Unemployment Compensation Continuation Act (or, if later, the date 
established pursuant to State law), and ending on or before March 1, 
2011, the State may by law provide that the determination of whether 
there has been a State `on' or `off' indicator beginning or ending any 
extended benefit period shall be made under this subsection as if 
paragraph (1)(A)(ii) had been amended--
            ``(A) by striking `either (or both)' and inserting `either 
        (or all)'; and
            ``(B) by striking `the preceding 2 calendar years' and 
        inserting `the preceding 3 calendar years'.
Notwithstanding any provision of a State law described in this 
paragraph, any week for which there would otherwise be a State `on' 
indicator shall continue to be such a week and shall not be determined 
to be a week for which there is a State `off' indicator.''.
                                 <all>