Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/22/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 01/22/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 01/22/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 02/04/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/24/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/24/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/24/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/03/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/03/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/03/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/04/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/04/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/04/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/05/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/05/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/10/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/12/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/18/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/19/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/19/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/19/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/19/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/19/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/19/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/19/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 03/19/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/25/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/25/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/25/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/30/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/30/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/21/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/21/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/21/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/21/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/21/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/23/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/04/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/06/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/12/2009