Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 01/21/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 01/21/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 01/22/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/22/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 01/22/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 01/22/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 01/26/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/26/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/26/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/03/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/03/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/03/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 02/03/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 02/03/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/03/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/10/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/10/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/25/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 02/25/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/03/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/03/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/03/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/04/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/05/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/10/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/24/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 03/25/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/21/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/21/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 04/29/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/15/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/08/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/08/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 10/21/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/03/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/03/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/24/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/10/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/12/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 03/16/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/21/2010