Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 09/14/2010
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 09/14/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 09/14/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/22/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/23/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/28/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/29/2010