Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 08/10/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 08/10/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 08/10/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/22/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/23/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/28/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 11/15/2010