Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 08/10/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 08/10/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 08/10/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/15/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/15/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 09/29/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 11/16/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 11/16/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/16/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/30/2010
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 11/30/2010