Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/30/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 08/10/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/14/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/14/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/14/2010
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 09/14/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 09/15/2010
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/15/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/15/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/15/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/15/2010
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/16/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/16/2010
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 09/16/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/16/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 09/20/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/22/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/22/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/23/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/23/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 09/23/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/28/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 09/28/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/28/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/15/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 11/15/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/15/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/17/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 12/02/2010
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 12/15/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 12/17/2010