Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/14/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/14/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 09/14/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/14/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/20/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/23/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/29/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 11/16/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 11/29/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/01/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 12/15/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 12/16/2010