Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/30/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 07/30/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 07/30/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 08/10/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 08/10/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 08/10/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 08/10/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/22/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/22/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/22/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/22/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/22/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/22/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 09/23/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/23/2010
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 09/23/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 09/23/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/28/2010
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 09/28/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/28/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/28/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/28/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/28/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 09/28/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/28/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/28/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 09/29/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/29/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 09/29/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/29/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 09/29/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/29/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/29/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/29/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 11/16/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/16/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 11/16/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/16/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 11/16/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/16/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/16/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/16/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 11/16/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/16/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/16/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/16/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 11/16/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/16/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/16/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/16/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/16/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 11/16/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/16/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/16/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 11/16/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 11/16/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/16/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 11/16/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 11/16/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 11/16/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/16/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 11/16/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 11/16/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 11/30/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 12/07/2010