Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/28/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/28/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/28/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/28/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/28/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/28/2010
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/28/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/28/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/28/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/28/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/28/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/28/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 09/28/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/28/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/28/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/28/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/28/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/28/2010
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 09/28/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 11/15/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 11/15/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/15/2010
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/15/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/15/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/15/2010
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/15/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 11/15/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/15/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/15/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 11/15/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 11/15/2010
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 11/15/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/15/2010
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 11/15/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 11/15/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/15/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 11/15/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 11/15/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 11/15/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 11/15/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 11/16/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/18/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/18/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/18/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/18/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/18/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/18/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 11/18/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 11/18/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 11/18/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 11/18/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 11/18/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 11/18/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 12/09/2010