Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 08/10/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/16/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 09/16/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/16/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/16/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/16/2010
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 09/16/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 09/16/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 09/16/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/16/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/16/2010
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 09/16/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 09/16/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/16/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 09/16/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 09/16/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/16/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 09/16/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/16/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/16/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/16/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 09/16/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 09/16/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/16/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/16/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 09/16/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/16/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/16/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/16/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/16/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 09/16/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/16/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/16/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/22/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/22/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 09/22/2010
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/22/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/22/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/22/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/22/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 09/22/2010
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 09/22/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 09/22/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 09/22/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/22/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/22/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/22/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/29/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/29/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/29/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/29/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 09/29/2010
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 09/29/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/29/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/29/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/29/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 09/29/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/29/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/29/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 09/29/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/29/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/29/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/29/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/29/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 09/29/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/29/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 09/29/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 09/29/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/29/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/29/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 09/29/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/29/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/29/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 09/29/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/29/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/29/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/29/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/29/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/29/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 09/29/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 12/07/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 12/07/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 12/07/2010