Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 07/30/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 08/09/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/15/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/15/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/15/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/18/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/18/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/18/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 12/09/2010