Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 07/27/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 07/27/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 07/27/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 07/27/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 07/27/2010
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/28/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/28/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/28/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/28/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/28/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/28/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/28/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/28/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/28/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/28/2010
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/28/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/29/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/29/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/29/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 08/10/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 08/10/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/16/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/16/2010
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 09/16/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/16/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 09/16/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 09/16/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/16/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/16/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 09/16/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/16/2010
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/16/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/16/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 09/22/2010
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 09/22/2010
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/22/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/22/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/22/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/22/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/22/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 11/15/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 11/15/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 11/15/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 11/15/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/15/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 11/15/2010
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 11/15/2010
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 11/15/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 11/15/2010