Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 07/15/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 07/15/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/19/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/19/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/19/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/19/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/19/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/19/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/22/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/22/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 07/22/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/22/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 07/22/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/22/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/27/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/30/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/30/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 08/10/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 08/10/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 08/10/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 08/10/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 09/28/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 09/28/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/28/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/28/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/28/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/28/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/29/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 11/15/2010