Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/21/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/21/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/21/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/21/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/21/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/21/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 07/29/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/29/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/29/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/29/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/29/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 07/29/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 07/29/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/29/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/29/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/29/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 07/29/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/29/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/29/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 07/29/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/29/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/29/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/29/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/29/2010
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/29/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/29/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/29/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/29/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/29/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/29/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/29/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/29/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/29/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/29/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/29/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/30/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/30/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/30/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/30/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/30/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 08/10/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 08/10/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 08/10/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 08/10/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 08/10/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 08/10/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 08/10/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 08/10/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 08/10/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 08/10/2010
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 09/14/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 09/14/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/14/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/14/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 09/14/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 09/14/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 09/14/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 09/14/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/14/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/14/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/14/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 09/14/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/14/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/14/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/14/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 09/14/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/14/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/14/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 09/14/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 09/14/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/16/2010
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/16/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 09/16/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 09/16/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/16/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 09/16/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/16/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 09/16/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/16/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 09/16/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/16/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 09/16/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/16/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/16/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 09/16/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 09/16/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/20/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 09/22/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/22/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/22/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/22/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/22/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/22/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/22/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 09/22/2010
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/22/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/22/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/22/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/28/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/28/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 09/28/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 09/28/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/28/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/28/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 09/28/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/28/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/28/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 09/28/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/28/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 09/28/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 09/28/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/29/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/29/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/29/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 09/29/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/29/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 09/29/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 09/29/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 12/02/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 12/02/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 12/02/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/02/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/02/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 12/02/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 12/02/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 12/02/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 12/02/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 12/02/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 12/02/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/02/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 12/02/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/02/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 12/02/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 12/02/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/02/2010