Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Public Law (11/30/2010)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on November 18, 2010. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Physician Payment and Therapy Relief Act of 2010 - Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to continue the existing 2.2% physician payment update that expires November 30, 2010, for an additional month through December 31, 2010.

Applies a 20% reduction, rather than the current 25% reduction, in the discount for certain multiple therapy services furnished on or after January 1, 2011. Exempts reduced expenditures attributable to the multiple procedure payment reduction from budget-neutrality requirements.

Declares that the budgetary effects of this Act, for purposes of complying with the Statutory Pay-As-You-Go Act of 2010, shall be determined by reference to the latest statement titled "Budgetary Effects of PAYGO Legislation" for this Act, provided that such statement has been submitted prior to the vote on passage.