Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/30/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/14/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/14/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 07/14/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/14/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 07/20/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/20/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/20/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/20/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/20/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/20/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/20/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/29/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/29/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/30/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/14/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/14/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 09/14/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/14/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/14/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/28/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/28/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/29/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/29/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 11/16/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/16/2010