Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/24/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 06/24/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 06/24/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 06/24/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 06/24/2010
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 06/24/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/24/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/01/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/13/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/13/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/13/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 07/13/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/19/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/19/2010
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 07/22/2010
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/28/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/28/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 07/28/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 07/28/2010
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/28/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/28/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/28/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/30/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/30/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/30/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 08/10/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 08/10/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/22/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/22/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/23/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/29/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/16/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/16/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/15/2010