Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/23/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/23/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/23/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 06/23/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 06/23/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 06/23/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/01/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/20/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/20/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 07/22/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/22/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 07/22/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/22/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/22/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/28/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/30/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/14/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/14/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/14/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/14/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/14/2010
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 09/14/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/14/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/16/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/22/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 09/22/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/28/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/16/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 11/16/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/16/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/16/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 11/16/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 11/16/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/16/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 11/16/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/30/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/02/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 12/08/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 12/08/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 12/16/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/16/2010