Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/17/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/17/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/17/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 06/17/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 06/17/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 06/17/2010
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 06/17/2010
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 06/17/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 06/17/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/17/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 06/17/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 06/17/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 06/17/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/22/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/22/2010
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 06/22/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/22/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 06/22/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/22/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/22/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/22/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/22/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 06/24/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 06/24/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 06/24/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/24/2010
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/29/2010
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/29/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/29/2010
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 07/01/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/14/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/14/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/15/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/15/2010