Refine your search

Date Major Actions
08/16/2010 Became Public Law No: 111-237.
08/16/2010 Signed by President.
08/10/2010 Presented to President.
08/05/2010 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6975)
06/29/2010 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 412 - 6 (Roll no. 400).(text: CR H4934)
06/17/2010 Introduced in House