Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 01/06/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/16/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/17/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 04/30/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/04/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/02/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/02/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/10/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/08/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/14/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/02/2010