Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 06/08/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/08/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 06/08/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 06/08/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 06/09/2010
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/14/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 06/14/2010
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 06/15/2010
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/17/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/28/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/01/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/19/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/22/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/26/2010