Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 05/28/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/28/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/28/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/28/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/28/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 05/28/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 05/28/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/28/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 05/28/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 05/28/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 05/28/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/28/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/28/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 05/28/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/28/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/28/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 05/28/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/28/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 05/28/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 05/28/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/28/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 05/28/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 05/28/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/08/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/15/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 06/17/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/17/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/22/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/24/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/24/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/24/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/30/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/30/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 07/19/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/21/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/21/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/27/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/27/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 08/10/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 08/10/2010
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 08/10/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 08/10/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 08/10/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 08/10/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 08/10/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 09/14/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/14/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 09/28/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/28/2010