Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/15/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/22/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/30/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/20/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/18/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 11/18/2010