Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 05/27/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/27/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 05/27/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/08/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/08/2010
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 06/08/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/08/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/08/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/08/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/08/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/08/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/08/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/09/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/09/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/09/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 06/10/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/14/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/14/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/14/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/14/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/14/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/15/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 06/15/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/16/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/16/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/16/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/16/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/16/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 06/17/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/17/2010
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/17/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/23/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/23/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/23/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/23/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/24/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/24/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/24/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/28/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/28/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/29/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/29/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/29/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/30/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 06/30/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/30/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/13/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/13/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/13/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/13/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/13/2010
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/13/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/13/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/13/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/13/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/13/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/13/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/13/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/13/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/13/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/13/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/13/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/13/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/14/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 07/14/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/14/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/15/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/15/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/19/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 07/19/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/20/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/20/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 07/20/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/20/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/20/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/20/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/21/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/21/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/21/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 07/21/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/22/2010
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/22/2010
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/26/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/26/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/26/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 07/26/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/28/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 07/28/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 07/28/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 07/28/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 07/28/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/28/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 07/28/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/28/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/29/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/30/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/30/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 07/30/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 08/10/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 08/10/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/15/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/15/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/15/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/23/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/23/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/23/2010
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/23/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/23/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/23/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/23/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 09/23/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/23/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/23/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/23/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 09/23/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/23/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/23/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 09/23/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/23/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/23/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/23/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/23/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 09/28/2010
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/28/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/28/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/28/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 09/29/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/29/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 09/29/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/29/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/29/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/29/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 11/16/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 11/16/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/16/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/16/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 11/16/2010
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 11/16/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 11/16/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 11/16/2010
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 11/16/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 11/16/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 12/15/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/21/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 12/21/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/22/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 12/22/2010