Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 05/26/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/26/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 06/10/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/15/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/15/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 06/17/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 06/17/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/01/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/01/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 07/30/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/08/2010