Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 05/25/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/26/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 05/26/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/26/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 06/10/2010
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/17/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/30/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 08/10/2010
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 08/10/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 09/14/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/14/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/14/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/14/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/14/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 09/14/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/14/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 09/14/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/14/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/14/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/14/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/14/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 09/14/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/14/2010
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 09/14/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/14/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/14/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/14/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/14/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 09/14/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/14/2010
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 09/14/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/14/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 09/16/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/20/2010
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/22/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 09/23/2010
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/23/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/23/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 09/23/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 09/23/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 09/23/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 09/23/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/23/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/23/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/23/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 09/23/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/23/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/23/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/23/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/23/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/23/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/23/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/23/2010
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 09/28/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/28/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/28/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/28/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/28/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 09/28/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 09/28/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/28/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/28/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/28/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 09/28/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/28/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/29/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 09/29/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/29/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/29/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/29/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/29/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/29/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 09/29/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/29/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/29/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 09/29/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/29/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/29/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/29/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/29/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 09/29/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/29/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 09/29/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 09/29/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/29/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/29/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 09/29/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/29/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/15/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 11/15/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/15/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 11/15/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 11/15/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 11/15/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 11/15/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 11/15/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 12/01/2010