Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 05/18/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 05/18/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/24/2010
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/09/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/22/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/13/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/13/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/13/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/13/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/13/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/13/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 07/13/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 07/13/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/13/2010
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/13/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/13/2010
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/13/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/13/2010
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/13/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/13/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/13/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/19/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/19/2010
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/20/2010
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 07/20/2010
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 07/21/2010
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/21/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 07/21/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/21/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/22/2010
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/22/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/22/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/22/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/29/2010