Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/11/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/12/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/12/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/12/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/12/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 05/12/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/12/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/13/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/13/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/13/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/18/2010
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/18/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/18/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/18/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/18/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/18/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/19/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/19/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/19/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/19/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/19/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 05/20/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/20/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/24/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/25/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 05/26/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/27/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/27/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/28/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/08/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 06/08/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/08/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/09/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/09/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/15/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/15/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/15/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/16/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/16/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/21/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/21/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/24/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/24/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/28/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/28/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/30/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/01/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/01/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/13/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/13/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/13/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/15/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/15/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/20/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/26/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/26/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 08/10/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 08/10/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 09/29/2010