Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 05/05/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 05/05/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/06/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/06/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/11/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/11/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/11/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 05/13/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/13/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/18/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/18/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/18/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/18/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/18/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/20/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/20/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/24/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/27/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/27/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 06/08/2010