Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 04/28/2010
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 04/28/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 04/28/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 04/29/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/29/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/11/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 05/11/2010
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 05/11/2010
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/19/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/20/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/08/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/08/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/09/2010
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 06/09/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/14/2010
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/14/2010
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 06/14/2010
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/16/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/16/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 06/16/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 06/16/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 06/23/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 06/23/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/23/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/01/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/01/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/01/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/01/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/14/2010
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/14/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/19/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 07/19/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 07/19/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/19/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/19/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/19/2010
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 07/19/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/19/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 07/19/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/19/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 07/19/2010
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 07/19/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/19/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/19/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/19/2010
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/19/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/19/2010
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 07/19/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 07/19/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/19/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/21/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/21/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/21/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/21/2010
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 07/22/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/27/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 07/27/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/27/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 07/27/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/27/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 07/27/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 07/29/2010
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 07/29/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/29/2010
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 07/29/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/29/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/29/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/29/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 07/29/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/29/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/29/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 07/29/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/29/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/29/2010
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/29/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/29/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/29/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/30/2010
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/30/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 07/30/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/30/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/30/2010
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/30/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 07/30/2010
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/30/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/30/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/30/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 07/30/2010
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 08/10/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 08/10/2010
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 08/10/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 08/10/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 08/10/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/15/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/15/2010
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 09/15/2010
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 09/16/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 09/16/2010