Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 04/21/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/22/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/26/2010
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/26/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 04/29/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/04/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/19/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 05/27/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/23/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 07/21/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/29/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/29/2010
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/15/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 09/15/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 09/29/2010