Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/22/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 04/26/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/05/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/18/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/20/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/20/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/20/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 05/20/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 05/25/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/25/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 05/25/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/25/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/27/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/27/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/28/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/10/2010
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 06/14/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/14/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/15/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/22/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/22/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/22/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/22/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 06/23/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/25/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/28/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/28/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/29/2010
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/29/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 06/30/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/30/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/13/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/13/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/13/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/13/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 07/13/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 07/14/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/14/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/14/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/15/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 07/15/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/19/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/19/2010
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/19/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 07/20/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/20/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/20/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/21/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/21/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/21/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/22/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/26/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/26/2010
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/27/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/27/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 07/28/2010
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/28/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/29/2010
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 07/29/2010
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/30/2010
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/30/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/30/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/14/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 09/15/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 09/16/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 09/22/2010
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 09/22/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 09/23/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/28/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 11/15/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 11/15/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 11/15/2010

Show cosponsors who withdrew